CA AB2119 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4012, 4033, 4051, 4094.5, 4096, 4096.5, 4240, 4341, 5020.1, 5120, 5326.2, 5346, 5348, 5349.1, 5585.10, 5585.57, 5600.3, 5680, 5681, 5682, 5683, 5685.5, 5686, 5688.6, 5691, 5694, 5694.7, 5695, 5695.2, 5696, 5698, 5699.2, 5731, 5801, 5802, 5806, 5814, 5814.5, 5840, 5846, 5851, 5852.5, 5855, 5856, 5856.2, 5860, 5878.1, 5878.2, 5878.3, 5880, 5886, 5900, 5903, 5909, 6552, and 18986.40 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 2.5 (commencing with Section 4240) of Part 2 of Division 4 of, to amend the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 5150) and Article 2 (commencing with Section 5200) of Chapter 2 of Part 1 of Division 5 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 5350) of Part 1 of Division 5 of, and to amend the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 5680), Article 5 (commencing with Section 5694.7), Article 6 (commencing with Section 5695), and Article 7 (commencing with Section 5698) of Chapter 2.5 of Part 2 of Division 5 of, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.
Title
Mental health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Assembly - AB 2119 Weber Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |