KY HCR124 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct the Legislative Research Commission to create the Penal Code Reform Task Force; establish membership; require report to the Legislative Research Commission.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION relating to the establishment of the Penal Code Reform Task Force.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 22, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2024-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-05 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |