NJ A3860 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-19 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes certain medical billing requirements concerning specific nature of charges or expenses for health care services.
Title
Establishes certain medical billing requirements concerning specific nature of charges or expenses for health care services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 7 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Not Reported (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Not Reported (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
2024-06-28 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (62-7-7) |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Amended but not reported |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2795 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee