PA HB1716 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-11-28 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 15 (Corporations and Unincorporated Associations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in entities generally, further providing for requirements for names generally and providing for registration of name of domestic nonfiling association; in entity transactions, further providing for nature of transactions and for approval by limited liability company; in foreign associations, further providing for foreign registration statement; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in corporate powers, duties and safeguards, further providing for certain specifically authorized debt terms; in officers, directors and shareholders, further providing for derivative action; in foreign business corporations, further providing for application of article; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in corporate powers, duties and safeguards, further providing for certain specifically authorized debt terms; in officers, directors and members, further providing for derivative action; in general partnerships, further providing for contents of partnership agreement; in limited partnerships, further providing for contents of partnership agreement and for derivative action; and, in limited liability companies, further providing for contents of operating agreement and for derivative action.
Title
In entities generally, further providing for requirements for names generally and providing for registration of name of domestic nonfiling association; in entity transactions, further providing for nature of transactions and for approval by limited liability company; in foreign associations, further providing for foreign registration statement; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in corporate powers, duties and safeguards, further providing for certain specifically authorized debt terms; in officers, directors and shareholders, further providing for derivative action; in foreign business corporations, further providing for application of article; in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in corporate powers, duties and safeguards, further providing for certain specifically authorized debt terms; in officers, directors and members, further providing for derivative action; in general partnerships, further providing for contents of partnership agreement; in limited partnerships, further providing for contents of partnership agreement and for derivative action; and, in limited liability companies, further providing for contents of operating agreement and for derivative action.
Sponsors
Rep. Perry Warren [D] | Rep. Maureen Madden [D] | Rep. Ben Sanchez [D] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Rep. David Delloso [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-11-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1716 PN 2230, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Floor: HB 1716 PN 2169, 2023 A2784 (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Floor: HB 1716 PN 2169, 2023 A2632 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-10-18 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended A02485 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A02485 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Commerce: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-11-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1716 PN 2230, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Floor: HB 1716 PN 2169, 2023 A2784 (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-10-31 - House - House Floor: HB 1716 PN 2169, 2023 A2632 (Y: 100 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-10-18 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Amended A02485 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Commerce: Adopt Amendment A02485 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-18 - House - House Commerce: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2023-11-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-11-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (203-0) |
2023-11-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-31 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-31 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-10-30 | House | Removed from table |
2023-10-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-10-18 | House | First consideration |
2023-10-18 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-09-26 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |