NY S05916 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - SIGNED CHAP.153
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts a civil claim or cause of action revived pursuant to section two hundred fourteen-j of the civil practice law and rules from certain filing and notice requirements.
Title
Exempts a civil claim or cause of action revived pursuant to section two hundred fourteen-j of the civil practice law and rules from certain filing and notice requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.153 |
2024-06-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.486 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a6138 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-05-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-03-27 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.716 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-05-09 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2023-05-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-01 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-04-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.648 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A06138 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s5916