MA S2120 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S2127
Note: Legislation replaced by H3858
Note: Legislation replaced by H3858
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - See H3858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-04 - See H3858
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The committee on Ways and Means, to whom was referred the House Bill to improve public records (House, No. 3858),-- reports, recommending that the same ought to pass with an amendment striking out all after the enacting clause and inserting in place thereof the text of Senate document numbered 2120; and by striking out the title and inserting in place thereof the following title:- “An Act improving the administration and enforcement of the public records law”.
Title
To improve public records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | See H3858 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Substituted as amended for H3858 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reprinted as amended, see S2127 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #64 (Spilka) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #46 (Keenan) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #15 (Brownsberger) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #63 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #24 (Eldridge) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #4 (Barrett) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #61 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #59 (O'Connor Ives) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #58 (Gobi) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #56 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #55 (Tarr) adopted - Roll Call #240 [YEAS 35 - NAYS 0] |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #54 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #53 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #52 (Tarr) laid aside |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #50 (Lovely) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #47 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #45 (Keenan) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #44 (Keenan) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #42 (Keenan) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #41 (Keenan) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #39 (Keenan) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #38 (Keenan) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #37 (Keenan) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #36 (Ross) rejected - Roll Call #238 [YEAS 6 - NAYS 30] |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #34 (Tarr) rejected - Roll Call #237 [YEAS 10 - NAYS 26] |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #33 (Keenan) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #32 (Lovely) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #31 (Ross) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #30 (O'Connor Ives) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #29 (Tarr) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #28 (Lewis) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #26 (Tarr) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #25 (Eldridge) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #22 (Eldridge) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #18 (Eldridge) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #16 (Brownsberger) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #14 (Brownsberger) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #13 (Brownsberger) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Rush) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #9 (Tarr) adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Eldridge) rejected |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Eldridge) adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 4, 2016 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Recommended new text for H3858 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
S2127 (Replaces) 2016-02-04 - See H3858
H3858 (Replaced by) 2016-05-23 - Reported by H4333
S1700 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1744 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1576 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1575 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S769 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H2784 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2133 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Accompanied H2163
H3858 (Replaced by) 2016-05-23 - Reported by H4333
S1700 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1744 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1576 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1575 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S769 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
H2784 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2133 (Similar To) 2016-03-17 - Accompanied H2163
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2120 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S2120.pdf |