MA H2133 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H2163
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Accompanied H2163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-17 - Accompanied H2163
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to elevator, escalator and moving walk safety. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
Relative to vertical reciprocating conveyors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Accompanied H2163 |
2015-10-09 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
H2163 (Replaced by) 2016-03-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2747 (Similar To) 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2016
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
H2747 (Similar To) 2016-04-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 83 of the Acts of 2016
H3007 (Similar To) 2015-10-08 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H2923 (Similar To) 2015-12-21 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H386 (Similar To) 2016-04-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4143
H3188 (Similar To) 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 25 of the Acts of 2015
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2133 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2133.pdf |