MA S1723 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2386

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to direct the Commissioner of Fisheries, Wildlife and Recreational Vehicles to convey certain land in Newbury to Richard J. Boudreau and Pauline C. Boudreau. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Directing the Commissioner of Fisheries, Wildlife and Recreational Vehicles to convey certain land in Newbury to Richard J. Boudreau and Pauline C. Boudreau

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2386
2015-05-01JointHearing scheduled for 05/06/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1107 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S2333 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S976 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Accompanied H3849
S881 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1531 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1693 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2133
S1639 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1701 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Hearing scheduled for 05/10/2016 from 10:30 AM-12:00 PM in 222
S1437 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1712 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Read second, amended and ordered to a third reading
S1606 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1050 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1008 (Similar To) 2016-05-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4351

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback