MA S976 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3849

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-31 - Accompanied H3849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to increase injured workers’ access to medical care and workers’ compensation benefits. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increasing injured workers’ access to medical care and workers’ compensation benefits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-31HouseAccompanied H3849
2016-04-04SenateSenate concurred
2016-03-31HouseDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-05-21JointHearing scheduled for 05/26/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H3849 (Replaced by) 2016-05-31 - Referred to the committee on House Ways and Means with the amendment pending
S1355 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1431 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1430 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1331 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1382 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1908 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
S1262 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1264 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1266 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1267 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1293 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback