MA S1531 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2290

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to a municipality’s right of first refusal of agricultural land. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to a municipality’s right of first refusal of agricultural land

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2290
2015-05-27JointHearing scheduled for 06/02/2015 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

S2290 (Replaced by) 2016-05-12 - Reported in part by S1494
S1030 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
H377 (Similar To) 2016-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4592
S948 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1199 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
H710 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback