PA HB1333 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-12 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 25, 1961 (P.L.857, No.372), referred to as the Stuffed Toy Manufacturing Act, further providing for definitions, for manufacturing, for materials and for enforcement; and providing for labeling and for report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions, for manufacturing, for materials and for enforcement; and providing for labeling and for report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1333 PN 3295, Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Adopt Amendment A04771 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-05 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1333 PN 1721, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 163 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1333 PN 1476, 2023 A1275 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1333 PN 1476, 2023 A1274 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1333 PN 1476, 2023 A1069 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-13 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-12HouseReferred to RULES
2024-06-12HouseIn the House
2024-06-12SenateThird consideration and final passage (47-1)
2024-06-11SenateRe-reported as amended
2024-06-10SenateRe-referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2024-06-10SenateRe-reported as committed
2024-06-10SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2024-06-10SenateSecond consideration
2024-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2024-06-05SenateReported as committed
2023-07-06SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2023-06-27SenateIn the Senate
2023-06-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (163-40)
2023-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-06-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2023-06-26HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2023-06-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2023-06-13HouseRe-committed to RULES
2023-06-13HouseFirst consideration
2023-06-13HouseReported as committed
2023-06-07HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2023&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1333
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1333&pn=1476
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1333&pn=1721
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2023&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1333&pn=3295
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1333&pn=1476&aYear=2023&an=01275
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1333&pn=1476&aYear=2023&an=01274
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1333&pn=1476&aYear=2023&an=01069
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2023&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1333&pn=1721&aYear=2023&an=04771
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2023/0/HB1333P1721.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/SFN/2023/0/HB1333P1721.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=06/13/2023&RollCallId=382
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=67&theDate=06/26/2023&RollCallId=620
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=339
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=340
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=341
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&cteeCde=62&theDate=06/27/2023&RollCallId=651
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=389
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=06/05/2024&RollCallId=969
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/10/2024&RollCallId=989
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/11/2024&RollCallId=1017
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2023&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=17&theDate=06/11/2024&RollCallId=1016
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2023&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=513

Bill Comments

feedback