MA S1647 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2386

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish an office of Access and Opportunities. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing an office of Access and Opportunities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2386
2015-11-04JointHearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S2386 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H135 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S1215 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
S237 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1070 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback