MA S1064 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of a county stabilization fund. Municipalities and Regional Government.
Title
Relative to the establishment of a county stabilization fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-14 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016 | |
2016-07-07 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2016-07-07 | House | Enacted |
2016-07-07 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-06-27 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-06-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-06-27 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-06-13 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2016-05-23 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Read second, ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass |
2015-10-01 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2015-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Municipalities and Regional Government |
Same As/Similar To
S1215 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1647 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S237 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1070 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
S121 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2358
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1535 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S194 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1647 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S237 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1070 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2065
S121 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2358
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1535 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S194 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1064 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1064.pdf |