MA S237 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2215

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a permanent annual sales tax holiday. Economic Development and Emerging Technologies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a permanent annual sales tax holiday

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2215
2015-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/10/2015 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Economic Development and Emerging Technologies

Same As/Similar To

S2215 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Reported in part by S224
S236 (Similar To) 2015-07-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3659
S121 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2358
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1535 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S194 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1215 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1608 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1647 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
S374 (Similar To) 2016-03-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4134
S2065 (Similar To) 2015-11-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2320 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4637
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
H2548 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback