MA H2548 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3639
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of net worth in determining corporate excise taxes. Revenue.
Title
To Clarify the Net-worth Measure of the Corporate Excise
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Hunt [R] | Rep. David DeCoste [R] | Rep. Steven Howitt [R] | Rep. Leonard Mirra [R] |
Rep. Mathew Muratore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3639 |
2015-06-05 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
H3639 (Replaced by) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2548 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H2548.pdf |