MA S1215 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2199

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish the Massachusetts Cemeteries Board of Oversight. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the Massachusetts Cemeteries Board of Oversight

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-28SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2199
2015-06-15JointHearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2199 (Replaced by) 2016-06-13 - Reported (in part) by S1231
S1098 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S1178 (Similar To) 2016-02-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2128
S1647 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1208 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
S1064 (Similar To) 2016-07-14 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 151 of the Acts of 2016
S237 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2215
S1379 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1535 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1206 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1358 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S2438 (Similar To) -

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback