MA S1208 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4065

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4065
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to food labeling. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to food labeling

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-14HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4065
2015-09-10JointHearing scheduled for 09/17/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4065 (Replaced by) 2016-05-25 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1914 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
H1970 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H1907 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H2084 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1982 (Similar To) 2016-05-19 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback