MA H1982 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-19 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to death certificates. Public Health.
Title
Relative to death certificates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2015-06-15 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/23/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1400 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - No further action
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
H1401 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1392 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1396 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1397 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H4743 (Similar To) 2017-01-11 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 383 of the Acts of 2016
H4747 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 412 of the Acts of 2016
H4753 (Similar To) 2016-12-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4770
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1982 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1982.pdf |