MA S1206 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to patient safety. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to patient safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2016-02-29HouseHouse concurred
2016-02-25SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-10-13JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S557 (Similar To) 2015-12-24 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S853 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1124 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4039
S1118 (Similar To) 2015-12-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2076
S2076 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1141 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2294
S991 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
H2041 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4686
H1803 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S1066 (Similar To) 2017-01-03 - Read second and ordered to a third reading

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback