MA S1141 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2294
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2294
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2294
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to volunteer ambulance service. Public Health.
Title
Relative to volunteer ambulance service
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-16 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2294 |
2016-03-16 | House | House concurred |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Monday May 16, 2016, pending concurrence |
2015-04-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/05/2015 from 02:30 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S2294 (Replaced by) 2016-06-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1957 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1007 (Similar To) 2015-10-21 - Resolutions adopted 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 166)
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
H2410 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied S283
H1965 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H970 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
S1957 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1007 (Similar To) 2015-10-21 - Resolutions adopted 156 YEAS to 0 NAYS (See YEA and NAY in Supplement, No. 166)
S1218 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2149
H2410 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied S283
H1965 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4638
H970 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1141 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S1141.pdf |