MA S991 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4605

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to fair hiring practices. Labor and Workforce Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fair hiring practices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-12HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4605
2015-07-20JointHearing scheduled for 07/21/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development

Same As/Similar To

H4605 (Replaced by) 2016-09-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S872 (Similar To) 2016-07-23 - New draft substituted, see S2444
S1163 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S2188 (Similar To) 2016-04-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S1565 (Similar To) 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
H352 (Similar To) 2016-09-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4601

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback