MA S1565 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H3639

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-01 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3639
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to clarify the net-worth measure of the corporate excise. Revenue.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To clarify the net-worth measure of the corporate excise

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-01HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H3639
2015-06-05JointHearing scheduled for 06/09/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Revenue

Same As/Similar To

H3639 (Replaced by) 2015-07-01 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1510 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S101 (Similar To) 2015-10-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1720 (Similar To) 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S634 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S104 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2257

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback