MA S1720 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-02-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to accelerate innovation and entrepreneurship by partnering world-class innovators with state agencies. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To accelerate innovation and entrepreneurship by partnering world-class innovators with state agencies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-18SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-11-04JointHearing scheduled for 11/09/2015 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight

Same As/Similar To

S191 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1662 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1727 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
S1729 (Similar To) 2016-04-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2850 (Similar To) 2016-04-11 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2784 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1513 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1540 (Similar To) 2016-02-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2151

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback