CA AB2143 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 9:30 am in 1021 O Street, Room 1100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19542, 19547, 19601.4, 19606.1, and 19614 of, to repeal Sections 19418.1, 19418.2, 19418.3, 19418.5, 19616.52, 19620, 19620.1, 19620.15, 19620.2, 19621, 19621.1, 19622, 19622.1, 19622.2, 19622.3, 19623, 19627.5, 19628, 19629, 19630, 19631, 19632, 19636, 19637, and 19638 of, and to repeal and add Section 19418 of, the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 1352 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 3200, 4003, 4060, 4202, 4534, 4701, and 24013.5 of, to amend the heading of Chapter 3 (commencing with Section 3200) of Part 1 of Division 3 of, to add Sections 3201, 3202, 3203, 3204, 3205, 3206, 3207, 3208, 3209, 3210, 3211, 3212, 3213, 3214, 3215, 3216, 3217, 3218, 3219, 3220, 3221, 3222, 3223, and 3224 to, to add Article 3.7 (commencing with Section 4165) to Chapter 6 of Part 3 of Division 3 of, to repeal Sections 4210, 4651, and 4652 of, to repeal Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 3851) of Part 3 of Division 3 of, and to repeal and add Chapter 2 (commencing with Section 3101) of Part 1 of Division 3 of, the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 6546, 25903, and 25906 of, and to repeal Section 13083 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 27575 and 27575.1 of the Penal Code, to amend Sections 5096.339 and 80074 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Section 605 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to fairs, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Fairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 8. |
2024-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |