IL SB0727 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-03-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-03-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1077
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Safe Public Drinking Water Act. Provides that within one year of the United States Environmental Protection Agency (USEPA) promulgating regulations or amendments that establish maximum contaminant levels (MCLs) for any perfluoroalkyl substance, the Pollution Control Board shall adopt rules which are identical to such federal regulations or amendments. Requires the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency to, by June 30, 2026, conduct sampling of the Illinois community water supplies previously sampled by the Agency for 1,4-Dioxane from the years 2013 through 2015. Provides that if the results of such sampling detect drinking water levels of 1,4-Dioxane in excess of the USEPA Health Reference Level of 35 micrograms per liter, then the Agency shall, within 2 years after June 30, 2026, take all actions needed to obtain the expertise necessary to propose rules to establish a State-only MCL for 1,4-Dioxane. Contains provisions concerning: (i) the adoption of rules by June 30, 2030 that establish a State-only MCL for 1,4-Dioxane; and (ii) annual chemical reviews by a stakeholder group for the purpose of proposing or revising a State-only MCL for those chemicals that are likely to pose a health hazard to Illinois residents.
Title
HEALTH-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2025-01-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-03-21 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1077 |
2025-03-21 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2026 |
2025-03-21 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2025-01-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2025-01-06 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2025-01-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2025-01-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2025-01-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2025-01-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2025-01-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2025-01-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2025-01-06 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2025-01-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2025-01-05 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2025-01-05 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2025-01-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2025-01-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 023-001-000 |
2025-01-05 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 070-031-000 |
2025-01-05 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Energy & Environment Committee; Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2025-01-05 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2025-01-05 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 8, 2025 |
2024-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-26 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2024 |
2024-05-24 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-05-20 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-20 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-17 | House | First Reading |
2024-05-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Lakesia Collins |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Simmons |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024 |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 008-000-000 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Environment and Conservation |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Simmons |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2024 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 43 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |