AK SB179 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-10-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to municipal property tax; relating to assessment of property, boards of equalization, and certification of assessors; prohibiting municipalities from levying a tax on the transfer of real property; prohibiting the state from levying a tax on the transfer of real property; relating to municipal taxation of mobile telecommunications services; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Muni Property Tax/telecomm Tax; Xfer Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 179(CRA) Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Rescind Previous Action in Adopting Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Advance to Third Reading on the Same Day Withdraw (Y: 24 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 4 (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 16 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-05-14 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Rules HCS (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-10-09SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2024-10-09SenateSIGNED INTO LAW 8/13 CHAPTER 28 SLA 24
2024-10-09Senate10:45 A.M. 7/22/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2024-10-09SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2024-05-15SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2024-05-15SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2024-05-15SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
2024-05-14HouseVERSION: HCS CSSB 179(RLS)
2024-05-14HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2024-05-14HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER, JOSEPHSON
2024-05-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2024-05-14HousePASSED Y39 N1
2024-05-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 179(RLS)
2024-05-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING SAME DAY Y39 N1
2024-05-14HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y18 N22
2024-05-14HouseRESCIND ACTION (ADOPTING) AM 1 PASSED Y22 N18
2024-05-14HouseMOTION TO ADVANCE TO THIRD SAME DAY WITHDRAWN Y24 N16
2024-05-14HouseAM NOS 5 AND 6 NOT OFFERED
2024-05-14HouseAM NO 4 WITHDRAWN
2024-05-14HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
2024-05-14HouseAM 1 TO AM 4 FAILED Y17 N22 A1
2024-05-14HouseAM NO 4 OFFERED
2024-05-14HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y1 N38 A1
2024-05-14HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y19 N20 A1
2024-05-14HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y24 N15 A1
2024-05-14HouseAM 1 TO AM 1 FAILED Y16 N22 A2
2024-05-14HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED
2024-05-14HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 24
2024-05-14HouseRLS HCS ADOPTED Y37 N1 A2
2024-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2024-05-14HouseMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2024-05-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024
2024-05-14HouseFN3: ZERO(CED)
2024-05-14HouseFN1: ZERO(REV)
2024-05-14HouseDP: FIELDS, SUMNER, SHAW, SCHRAGE, ALLARD, TILTON, C.JOHNSON
2024-05-14HouseTITLE CHANGE: HCR 24
2024-05-14HouseRLS RPT HCS(RLS) NEW TITLE 7DP
2024-05-06HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): VANCE
2024-04-26HouseFN2: ZERO(CED)
2024-04-26HouseFN1: ZERO(REV)
2024-04-26HouseNR: MEARS, HIMSCHOOT, MCKAY, BAKER, MCCORMICK
2024-04-26HouseDNP: MCCABE
2024-04-26HouseDP: RUFFRIDGE
2024-04-26HouseCRA RPT HCS(CRA) 1DP 1DNP 5NR
2024-04-22HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): COULOMBE
2024-04-05HouseCRA
2024-04-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2024-04-03SenateVERSION: CSSB 179(CRA)
2024-04-03SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2024-04-03SenatePASSED Y16 N3 E1
2024-04-03SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 179(CRA)
2024-04-02SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/3 CAL
2024-04-02SenateCRA CS ADOPTED UC
2024-04-02SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2024-04-02SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2024
2024-03-04SenateFN1: ZERO(REV)
2024-03-04SenateDP: DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON, GIESSEL, BJORKMAN
2024-03-04SenateCRA RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
2024-01-16SenateCOSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON
2024-01-16SenateCRA
2024-01-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2024-01-16SenatePREFILE RELEASED 1/12/24

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/33?Root=SB179
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0179A.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0179B.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0179C.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0179D.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0179E.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/F/SB0179-1-2-030424-REV-N.PDF
Texthttps://www.akleg.gov/PDF/33/Bills/SB0179Z.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=S&Bill=SB179&Page=02067#2067
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03179#3179
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03181#3181
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03181#AM1
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03182#AM2
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03184#AM3
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03187#3187
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03189#3189
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03190#3190
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03191#3191
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=H&Bill=SB179&Page=03190#AM1
Roll Callhttps://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/33?Chamber=S&Bill=SB179&Page=02753#2753

Bill Comments

feedback