MA S634 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-05-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to address the lack of sex-specific data in Massachusetts. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To address the lack of sex-specific data in Massachusetts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-05SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2015-05-29JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S467 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S566 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
H879 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
S631 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1407 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2382
H898 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
S1344 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback