MA H879 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4684

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to health insurance coverage for mastectomies. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mastectomies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-10-06HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4684
2016-06-09SenateSenate concurred
2016-05-26HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday July 6, 2016, pending concurrence
2016-03-21HouseHouse concurred in the Senate amendment
2016-03-17SenateAmendment adopted, pending concurrence
2016-03-16HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 18, 2016, pending concurrence
2015-10-13JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

H4684 (Replaced by) 2016-10-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H931 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4049
H898 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
S497 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S467 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S422 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S495 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - New draft substituted, see S2374

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback