MA S422 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H769

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to the use of artificial lights in hunting. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of artificial lights in hunting

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-10SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2016-03-10SenateAccompanied by H769
2015-11-02JointHearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

H769 (Replaces) 2016-03-10 - Accompanied S422
S412 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S414 (Similar To) 2016-08-02 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S415 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S424 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S415
S446 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2069
S427 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied S414
H662 (Similar To) 2016-09-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H711 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H713 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H714 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
H728 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback