MA H769 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S422
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Accompanied S422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Accompanied S422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the hunting of coyotes with artificial light. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to hunting with artificial light
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Accompanied S422 |
2015-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Division of Fisheries and Wildlife |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S422 (Replaced by) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1647 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H1647 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H1646 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3109 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1645 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2841 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H769 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H769.pdf |