MA S467 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2380

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to wastewater facilities. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An act relative to wastewater facilities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-05SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2380
2015-10-14JointHearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture

Same As/Similar To

S2380 (Replaced by) 2016-07-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S410 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Resolve reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1726 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2386
H695 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4212 (Similar To) 2016-05-11 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S1243 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback