MA S101 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 15 2015 - 50% progression
Action: 2015-10-19 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to revise the interstate compact on the placement of children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revising the interstate compact on the placement of children

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-10-19HouseRead; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2015-10-15SenateRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2015-10-15SenatePassed to be engrossed -- see Roll Call #182 (37 Yeas -0 Nays)
2015-10-15SenateAmendment (Tarr) rejected
2015-10-15SenateRead third
2015-10-15SenateRules suspended
2015-10-15SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2015-10-13SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday October 15, 2015
2015-10-13SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
2015-07-21SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-06-10JointHearing scheduled for 06/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S25 (Similar To) 2015-04-01 - Accompanied S39
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H120 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1448 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H3906 (Similar To) 2016-05-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4331

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback