MA H117 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4613
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the licensure and regulation of au pair and nanny agencies by the Office of Child Care Services. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to the licensure and regulation of au pair and nanny agencies by the Department of Early Education and Care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4613 |
2015-06-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4613 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H254 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H254 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H117 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H117.pdf |