MA H254 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4135
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of magnetic identification card reader machines when purchasing alcohol. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to the use of a magnetic identification card reader machine when purchasing alcohol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4135 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4135 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
H115 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H250 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H251 (Similar To) 2016-08-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4578
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H254 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H254.pdf |