MA H4135 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S180
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an out of state license to be valid proof of age
Title
Providing for an out of state license to be valid proof of age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2016-04-04 | House | New draft of S180, S206, H254 and H3385 |
2016-04-04 | House | Reported from the committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
S180 (Replaces) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
H3368 (Similar To) 2015-07-27 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H3691
H3369 (Similar To) 2015-10-22 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 106 of the Acts of 2015
H3370 (Similar To) 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 43 of the Acts of 2015
H3371 (Similar To) 2016-03-31 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 67 of the Acts of 2016
H3372 (Similar To) 2016-02-10 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 33 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4135 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H4135.pdf |