MA S180 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4135
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for an out of state license to be valid proof of age. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Providing for an out of state license to be valid proof of age
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4135 |
2015-10-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-04-15 | House | House concurred |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4135 (Replaced by) 2016-04-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1904 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3122 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H3143 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H3067 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H4159 (Similar To) 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2016
S1904 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3122 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H3143 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4084
H3067 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H4159 (Similar To) 2016-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 193 of the Acts of 2016
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S180 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/S180.pdf |