MA H4613 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on September 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Study Order

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study Order

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-19HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2016-09-19HouseOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules
2016-09-19HouseAccompanied by S62, S68, S74, S78, S80, S85, S97, S98, S99, S100, S108, S1043, H68, H69, H72, H73, H77, H80, H87, H88, H89, H92, H93, H100, H102, H103, H104, H105, H106, H109, H111, H115, H116, H117, H119, H122, H123, H134, H137, H1319, H1816, H3209, H3210, H3211, H3380 and H3647
2016-09-19HouseReported from the committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S62 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S68 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S74 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S78 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S80 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S85 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S97 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S98 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S99 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S100 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S108 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1043 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H68 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H69 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H72 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H73 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H77 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H80 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H87 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H88 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H89 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H92 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H93 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H100 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H102 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H103 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H104 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H105 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H106 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H109 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H111 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H115 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H116 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H117 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H119 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H122 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H123 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H134 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H137 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H1319 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H1816 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H3209 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H3210 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H3211 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H3380 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H3647 (Replaces) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S2270 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4117 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4679 (Similar To) 2016-10-06 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3838 (Similar To) 2015-11-04 - See H3829
S2156 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Read third and passed to be engrossed

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback