MA S99 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4613

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to prevention of EBT fraud. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to prevention of EBT fraud

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-09-19HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4613
2015-10-13JointHearing rescheduled to 10/13/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-10-01JointHearing scheduled for 10/13/2015 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

H4613 (Replaced by) 2016-09-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S100 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1203 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S398 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S251 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S347 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2347
S316 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback