MA S284 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1796
Note: Legislation replaced by S2356

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to preventing adolescent substance abuse by expanding SBIRT. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to preventing adolescent substance abuse by expanding SBIRT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2356
2015-07-23SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2015-07-23SenateAccompanied by H1796
2015-07-10JointHearing scheduled for 07/16/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-06-24HouseHouse concurred
2015-06-22SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Mental Health and Substance Abuse
2015-06-03JointHearing cancelled for S284 – new hearing TBD
2015-05-26JointHearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

H1796 (Replaces) 2015-07-23 - Accompanied S284
S2356 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S2103 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - See H3947
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
S1203 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S398 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S251 (Similar To) 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S347 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2347
S316 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2345
S99 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S1052 (Similar To) 2016-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4272
S966 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2207
S905 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2417
S1237 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S871 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback