MA S251 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to dropout prevention and recovery. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to dropout prevention and recovery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-23SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2015-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/12/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S208 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Read and referred to the Joint Committee on Ways and Means
S284 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1203 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S398 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2380
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S99 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
S347 (Similar To) 2016-06-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2347
S966 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2207
S778 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1210 (Similar To) 2016-07-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2411
S1237 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S871 (Similar To) 2016-04-04 - Accompanied a study order, see S2204
S1243 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback