MA S1308 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2362

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to change the composition of the Board of Fire Prevention Regulations. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing the composition of the Board of Fire Prevention Regulations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2362
2015-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2015 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
2015-06-04JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2015-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/10/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1195 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S1342 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
H1827 (Similar To) 2016-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4606
H1050 (Similar To) 2016-04-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4228
S1420 (Similar To) 2016-12-08 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H3210 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback