MA S2362 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on June 23 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to public safety.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-27SenateDischarged to the committee on Senate Rules
2016-06-23SenateOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied by S428, S1084, S1198, S1234, S1237, S1239, S1240, S1242, S1243, S1244, S1245, S1246, S1247, S1253, S1255, S1256, S1257, S1259, S1261, S1262, S1263, S1265, S1266, S1267, S1268, S1269, S1270, S1272, S1273, S1274, S1276, S1277, S1279, S1292, S1293, S1294, S1299, S1300, S1302, S1304, S1306, S1308, S1317, S1319 and S1320
2016-06-23SenateReported from the committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S428 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1084 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1198 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1234 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1237 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1239 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1240 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1242 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1243 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1244 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1245 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1246 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1247 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1253 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1255 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1256 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1257 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1259 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1261 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1262 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1263 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1265 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1266 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1267 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1268 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1269 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1270 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1272 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1273 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1274 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1276 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1277 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1279 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1292 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1293 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1294 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1299 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1300 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1302 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1304 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1306 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1308 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1317 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1319 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1320 (Replaces) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
H4241 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Senate concurred
H4611 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4103 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H4443 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2036 (Similar To) 2015-11-25 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback