MA S1292 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2362

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Petruccelli, a petition of Anthony W. Petruccelli that employees performing inspections of fire sprinkler systems be licensed to perform such inspections. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to fire safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2362
2015-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2015 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
2015-06-04JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2015-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/10/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1611 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S205 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S190 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S200 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S1120 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2212
S2185 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
S142 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S141 (Similar To) 2016-03-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H40 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
S163 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
H2006 (Similar To) 2016-06-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2352

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback