MA S1120 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2212

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2212
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to requiring the licensure of persons engaged in the removal of body art. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the licensure of persons engaged in the removal of body art

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-07SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2212
2016-01-20JointHearing scheduled for 01/26/2016 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-10-30JointHearing scheduled for 11/10/2015 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in 437
2015-06-22HouseHouse concurred
2015-06-18SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

S2212 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S205 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S190 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357
S2185 (Similar To) 2016-03-16 - Adopted, in concurrence
S2378 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S163 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2357

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback