CA AB1005 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-01 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 442.9 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 12309.2 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to in-home supportive services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In-home supportive services: terminal illness diagnosis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-08-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Health] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1005 Alvarez Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-01SenateIn committee: Held under submission.
2023-08-14SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR suspense file.
2023-07-06SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-06-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2023-06-07SenateReferred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and HEALTH.
2023-05-31SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2023-05-30AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1926.)
2023-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2023-05-18AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (May 18).
2023-05-18AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.)
2023-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2023-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-19AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2023-04-18AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2023-04-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
2023-03-23AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended.
2023-03-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2023-02-16AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
2023-02-15AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code442.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Welfare and Institutions Code12309.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback