MA S1261 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2362

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to police pursuits in the Commonwealth. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to police pursuits in the Commonwealth

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-23SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2362
2016-01-28JointHearing scheduled for 02/04/2016 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in B-1
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

S2362 (Replaced by) 2016-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S1137 (Similar To) 2016-03-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2152
S1854 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1824 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2266
S2266 (Similar To) 2016-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2505
S2505 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 448 of the Acts of 2016
H2186 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3124 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H3005 (Similar To) 2016-06-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H4438
H1658 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H3037 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback