MA H2186 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to standards and qualifications for the positions of fire chief and chief engineer in cities, towns, fire districts and authorities. Public Safety and Homeland Security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to standards and qualifications for the position of fire chief or chief engineer in cities, towns, fire districts, or authorities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-12HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2015-06-04JointHearing scheduled for 06/18/2015 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-2
2015-06-04JointHearing canceled – new hearing TBD
2015-06-02JointHearing scheduled for 06/10/2015 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1
2015-01-20SenateSenate concurred
2015-01-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Same As/Similar To

H2917 (Similar To) 2016-04-07 - Accompanied a study order, see H4177
H1627 (Similar To) 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H501 (Similar To) 2016-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4297
H2075 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H2184 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback