MA S1824 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2266

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2266
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to promote electric vehicle adoption. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Promoting electric vehicle adoption

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-02SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2266
2016-02-17JointHearing scheduled for 02/24/2016 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2015-04-15HouseHouse concurred
2015-04-15SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S2266 (Replaced by) 2016-11-10 - New draft substituted, see S2505
S1771 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2366
S1587 (Similar To) 2016-05-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2290
S1323 (Similar To) 2016-03-07 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1308 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2362
S1759 (Similar To) 2016-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2274
S1363 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2314
S1828 (Similar To) 2016-07-05 - Accompanied a study order, see S2387
S2333 (Similar To) 2016-06-09 - See S2311
S2505 (Similar To) 2017-01-13 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 448 of the Acts of 2016

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback