CA SB1331 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 6.1 (commencing with Section 6630) to Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
The Fund for Reparations and Reparative Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6630 | New Code | See Bill Text |