CA AB295 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2924, 2924c, 2924h, 2924m, and 3273.10 of, and to add Section 2924.21 to, the Civil Code, relating to real property, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Residential real property: foreclosure.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 295 Vince Fong Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-04-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-07-11 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1997.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-10 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 25. |
2023-01-25 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 3273.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |